Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Coles, Scott Raymond (CPSO#: 68010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212
Fax: (705) 457-3955
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heyes ( CPSO# 26112 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212


Corporation Name: Scott Coles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
PO Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT RAYMOND COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996