Coll-Black, Mary Celia (CPSO#: 91453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics&Gynecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Coll-Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Coll-Black ( CPSO# 91453 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
St. Joseph's Hospital-2 Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY CELIA COLL-BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLL-BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014