Collins, Caroline Paschale (CPSO#: 82907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brameast Family Physicians
Unit 38 Ground Floor
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Collins ( CPSO# 82907 )

Business Address:
Brameast Family Physicians
Unit 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE PASCHALE COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007