Collins, David Robert (CPSO#: 80282)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2005