Collins, David Scott (CPSO#: 50278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3B
575 West Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 7N6
Phone: (705) 326-1031
Fax: (705) 326-9112
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David S. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Collins ( CPSO# 50278 )

Business Address:
Unit 3B
575 West Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 7N6
Phone Number: (705) 326-1030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Research Fellows - Cardiovascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1986