Collins, Douglas Brian (CPSO#: 68009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Friesen Place
Springwater ON  L9X 0T5
Phone: (705) 726-6065
Fax: (705) 726-6256
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas B. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Collins ( CPSO# 68009 )

Business Address:
2 Friesen Place
Barrie ON  L4M 4S4
Phone Number: (705) 726-4590

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS BRIAN COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996