Collins, Evan Jay (CPSO#: 50498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Immunodeficiency Clinic
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Ave
13N-1300
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5077
Fax: (416) 340-4890
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN JAY COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983