Collins, John Alfred (CPSO#: 17871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2000