Collins, Katherine Louise (CPSO#: 82819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: Martin, Katherine Louise (used until: 07 May 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2011