Collins, Kenneth Mark (CPSO#: 95187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540 Ext. 5467
Fax: (613) 961-5503
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2435
Fax: (613) 969-0229
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2368
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KM Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Collins ( CPSO# 95187 )

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH MARK COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014