Collins, Paul Jason (CPSO#: 73653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Fax: (519) 631-0921
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Collins ( CPSO# 73653 )

Business Address:
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 631-0567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JASON COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004