Collins, Peter Ian (CPSO#: 52404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
250 College Street
Room 630
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 979-6847
Fax: (416) 979-6965
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Criminal Behaviour Analysis Unit
Investigation & Support Bureau
Ontario Provincial Police
777 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V3
Canada
Phone: (705) 329-6351
Fax: (705) 329-6259
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter I. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Collins ( CPSO# 52404 )

Business Address:
630 - 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 979-6847

Business Address:
Criminal Behaviour Analysis Unit
Investigation & Support Bureau
Ontario Provincial Police
777 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V3
Phone Number: (705) 329-6351

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER IAN COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984