Collins, Ronald William (CPSO#: 50279)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald W. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical records may contact: Dr. Lawrence Schmidt Statesman Advanced Medical Group 230 Victoria Street London, ON N6A 2C2
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016