Collins, Stephen Michael (CPSO#: 32336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 2E16
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73884
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Collins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Collins ( CPSO# 32336 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 2E16
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-9140

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1981