Collinson, Elizabeth Grierson (CPSO#: 22339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 187 Queenston Street St. Catharines, Ontario L2R 3A3 Tel: (905) 688-5125 Fax: (905) 688-9648
Date Received: 21 Nov 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2012