Colman, Jack Marc (CPSO#: 25491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1603
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5288
Fax: (416) 586-5968
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peter Munk Cardiac Centre/UHN/TGH
CongenitalCardiacCentre for Adults
Suite 5N 523
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4871
Fax: (416) 586-5968
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK MARC COLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1973