Colman, Laurence David (CPSO#: 52916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd.
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 559 9685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurence Colman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Colman ( CPSO# 52916 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 559-9685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 20, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 22, 2011, William Osler Health System notified the College that Dr. Laurence David Colman's privileges were suspended effective September 20, 2011.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 16, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:

Notice received by the College from William Osler Health Centre of suspension of Dr. Lawrence D. Colman's privileges from June 16, 2009 to March 3, 2010.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 30, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Laurence David
            Colman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Colman to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Colman's office based gynecological practice is restricted to Level 1
                  and 2 ambulatory care procedures only and he may not perform any Level 3
                  procedures. 
                  
                  Dr. Colman's hospital practice is restricted to working as a surgical
                  assistant and attending to ante-natal and post-partum patients.