Colodny, Nikki (CPSO#: 50281)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Temple University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013