Colthart, John Marshall (CPSO#: 11186)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1943
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Mar 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1989