Coman-Wood, Lori Rae (CPSO#: 58459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-7044
Fax: (905) 274-0227
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Coman-Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Coman-Wood ( CPSO# 58459 )

Business Address:
333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-7044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI RAE COMAN-WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMAN-WOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988