Comeau, Byron Keith (CPSO#: 53063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 333-0116
Fax: (905) 333-5877
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Comeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Comeau ( CPSO# 53063 )

Business Address:
102 - 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 333-0116

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BYRON KEITH COMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Jan 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2000
Summary:

 On August 30, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Comeau(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

On 
 July 9, 2001, the Committee also ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Comeau be reprimanded and 
 that the reprimand be recorded on the register.
2.	Dr. Comeau(s certificate of registration be 
 suspended for a period of twelve months to 	commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar; 
 however, nine (9) of these months shall 	be suspended provided that:
a)	he continue in a 
 therapeutic relationship with his current treating psychiatrist or a 		psychiatrist acceptable to 
 the College;
b)	he sees his psychiatrist at least on a quarterly basis;
c)	his psychiatrist 
 provide to the College a written report annually (by the end of 		August in each year) until 
 August, 2006, commenting on his current medical 		status, including any psychiatric concerns 
 relating to his suitability to practice;
d) 	Dr. Comeau pay the costs for such reports;
e)	Dr. 
 Comeau reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient for 			counselling and therapy 
 not covered by OHIP, and that he provide a letter of credit 		or other security acceptable to the 
 College, for a period of 5 years, in the amount 		of $10,000, to guarantee the payment of any 
 amounts that may be so required.

Finally, in the event that any of the above conditions not be 
 met then the Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Comeau(s Certificate of Registration for the 
 remaining nine months of the suspension ordered.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Mar 2002
Hearing Date(s): Aug 30, 2000