Comeau, Christopher Edmund (CPSO#: 52873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
921 State Street
Ogdensburg NY  13669
United States
Phone: (315) 393-9269
Fax: (315) 393-3541

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDMUND COMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984