Comeau, Marie-Josee (CPSO#: 63453)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2004


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 1998 to 06 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2004