Comerford, Mary Louise (CPSO#: 71613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
3rd Floor, Rm 316-318
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2X5
Phone: (705) 743-6222
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Comerford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comerford ( CPSO# 71613 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
3rd Floor, Room 316-318
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2X5
Phone Number: (705) 743-6222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE COMERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMERFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999