Comette, Melissa Jayne (CPSO#: 76141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8223
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 372-2500
Fax: (519) 372-1005
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Comette, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comette ( CPSO# 76141 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Room 8223
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 372-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA JAYNE COMETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006