Comfort, Priyanka Simone (CPSO#: 111279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Child and Adolescent
Psychiatry
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYANKA SIMONE COMFORT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. COMFORT is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. COMFORT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COMFORT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. COMFORT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. COMFORT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. COMFORT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018