Comondore, Vikram Ravindran (CPSO#: 88184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 595-2870
Fax: (905) 595-2869
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7843
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3699
Fax: (905) 456-8768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram R. Comondore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Comondore ( CPSO# 88184 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 595-2870

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM RAVINDRAN COMONDORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMONDORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 31 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010