Compeau, Christopher Gary (CPSO#: 59320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6530
Fax: (416) 530-6529
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher G. Compeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Compeau ( CPSO# 59320 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
SSW214
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GARY COMPEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMPEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 11, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of May 18, 2016: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)