Compton, Amanda Y D (CPSO#: 86480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crown Point Family Health Centre
67 Kenilworth Ave N- lower level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: (905) 547-2303
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

suite 306-200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Canada
Phone: (289) 389-1811
Fax: (289) 389-1899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA Y D COMPTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMPTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009