Conacher, Geoffrey Neil (CPSO#: 56564)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Attn: Dr. Geoffrey Neil Conacher Providence Care Mental Health Services 525 Montreal Street Kingston, Ontario K7K 3H9
Date Received: 07 Apr 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010