Connell, Bruce Fowler (CPSO#: 57694)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 1998