Connell, Cathy Ann (CPSO#: 58343)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991