Connelly, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 69268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
4th Floor Box 119
99 Wayne Gretsky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Marie Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Connelly ( CPSO# 69268 )

Business Address:
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1997