Connelly, Paul Joseph James (CPSO#: 42796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PJJ Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Connelly ( CPSO# 42796 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Riverisde Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH JAMES CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988