Connelly, Ruth Anne (CPSO#: 50433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: Dickinson, Ruth Anne (used until: 10 Sep 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth A. Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Connelly ( CPSO# 50433 )

Business Address:
Suite 510
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH ANNE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1984