Connidis, Stephanie Arnet (CPSO#: 59362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie A. Connidis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Connidis ( CPSO# 59362 )

Business Address:
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ARNET CONNIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNIDIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989