Connolly, Barbara Sheila (CPSO#: 84933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
M-Wing
Room 711
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44235
Fax: (905) 577-8265
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA SHEILA CONNOLLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNOLLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013