Connolly, Brian Francis (CPSO#: 60487)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2011
Summary:

 On August 30, 2011, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Connolly's admission and found that he 
 committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that 
 is relevant to his suitability to practise.

On February 17, 2010, Dr. Connolly pleaded guilty and 
 was found guilty of committing an offence under s.44(1)(a) of the Health Insurance Act, by 
 submitting billings in the amount of $114,146.92 that did not comply with the requirements of the 
 Schedule of Benefits. The offence was alleged to have occurred between April 1, 2005 and September 
 15, 2008. The parties presented an Agreed Statement of Fact in the court proceeding, the final 
 paragraph of which states: "Dr. Connolly was not aware that the clinic owner was overbilling.  
 However, Dr. Connolly's liability for this regulatory offence lies in his failure to exercise due 
 diligence, that is in his failure to take all available, reasonable steps to ensure that the 
 clinic owner had not overbilled."

The Court accepted a joint submission on sentence and ordered: 
 a fine of $4,000, which totalled $5,000 with the 25% victim fine surcharge; and restitution in 
 favour of the Minister of Finance for $114,146.92.  This represented the total amount overbilled, 
 including $34,000 that was received by the clinic owner. Dr. Connolly made full restitution as 
 ordered.

Dr. Connolly has no prior history before the Discipline Committee.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:
1.	Dr. Connolly to appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.
2.	Dr. Connolly to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within sixty (60) 
 days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 30, 2011