Connolly, Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 85214)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 26 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007