Connolly, John Gerald (CPSO#: 17268)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010