Connolly, Stephen Harold (CPSO#: 72676)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1999