Connor, Ashton Antoine (CPSO#: 91256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Queen Wing 3 071
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5422
Fax: (416) 864-3083
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHTON ANTOINE CONNOR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CONNOR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CONNOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CONNOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CONNOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CONNOR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CONNOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018