Connors, Gregory Thomas (CPSO#: 54668)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Nov 1993 to 18 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 1993