Connors, Sean Patrick (CPSO#: 68460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Hospital
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Philip Drive
St John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6487

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN PATRICK CONNORS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNORS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 1994 to 07 Aug 1994
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996