Conrad, David Paul (CPSO#: 74353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
160 Elgin Street
Suite 2600
Ottawa ON  K1P 1C3
Phone: (613) 724-2881
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL CONRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 8 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999