Conrad, Dennis Roland (CPSO#: 42711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Pattermead Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1V 0G2
Phone: (613) 620-2521
Fax: (613) 736-9166
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS ROLAND CONRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONRAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1984

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On May 12, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, Ottawa, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Dennis Roland Conrad in respect of an incident that took place in June 2007.