Conrad, Tatiana Deirdre (CPSO#: 88449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive.
Newmarket, ON L3Y 2P9
Toronto ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: 905-952-2818
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON
M5G 2M9
Newmarket ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2132
Fax: 416-946-2111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tatiana Conrad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Conrad ( CPSO# 88449 )

Business Address:
610 Univeristy Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2132

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Sciences
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TATIANA DEIRDRE CONRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2009 to 24 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2010 to 24 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2011 to 24 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2014