Conran, Harold William Nicholas (CPSO#: 12520)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1948
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1988