Consky, Earl Sydney (CPSO#: 50286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 603-7904
Fax: (416) 603-7929
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EARL SYDNEY CONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1987