Constant Lohmann Palhares, Ana Elisa (CPSO#: 101844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
1284 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8659
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ana  Elisa  Constant  Lohmann Palhares may practise medicine only as
                  required  by  the  clinical fellowship  program  in  Medical  Oncology  &
                  Hematology in which  Dr.  Constant  Lohmann  Palhares  is enrolled in the
                  Department of Medicine, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr. Constant Lohmann Palhares shall prescribe drugs only  for in-patients
                  and out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally  affiliated
                  with  the  department  where  Dr.  Constant  Lohmann Palhares is properly
                  practising  medicine  and to which postgraduate  trainees  are  regularly
                  assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical
                  education;

            3.    Dr.  Constant  Lohmann Palhares  shall  not  charge  a  fee  for  medical
                  services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on July 31, 2018.

            Note:  This certificate  has  an  interim  expiry  date of June 30, 2018.  Upon
            renewal  of  Dr.  Constant  Lohmann Palhares's fellowship  appointment  at  the
            University  of  Toronto, the expiry  date  can  be  extended,  subject  to  the
            limitations in paragraph 4 above.